Financial history THE FRIENDS OF LEEN MILLS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1167604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £9.18k £465 £1.34k £4.59k £12.35k
Total expenditure £6.10k £3.89k £1.16k £1.60k £7.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A