DAWN CHRISTADELPHIAN PUBLICATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishing books, booklets and other religious information for distribution world-wide. Publishing "The Dawn" monthly magazine on behalf of the Dawn Christadelphian Fellowship. Making welfare grants and giving financial assistance for preaching activities in the UK and overseas. The Charity is based in Nottingham where it has an office and storage facilities for its publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 22 November 2016: Standard registration
- 22 August 2017: Funds received from 260436 THE DAWN BOOK SUPPLY
- THE DAWN BOOK SUPPLY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Kershaw | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Bronwen Wall | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Grimshaw | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Hazel Coverley | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Margaret Mitchell | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.89k | £33.23k | £30.83k | £40.25k | £35.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.37k | £65.36k | £54.60k | £54.89k | £79.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | £575 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ('THE OBJECT') WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS SET OUT IN THE DAWN CHRISTADELPHIAN STATEMENT OF FAITH WHICH CAN BE OBTAINED FROM THE DAWN BOOK SUPPLY, 5 STATION ROAD, CARLTON, NOTTINGHAM NG4 3AT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 STATION ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG43AT
- Phone:
- 01159612624
- Email:
- info@dawncp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window