QUEEN ELIZABETH THE SECOND SILVER JUBILEE SCHOLARSHIP TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL TRAINING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Tameside
Governance
- 10 December 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR GED COONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS CONDLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIM TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 4 DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 5 JANUARY 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS. TEN EACH YEAR AT THE TAMESIDE COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY AND ONE EACH YEAR AT A THEOLOGICAL PLACE OF STUDY EACH SCHOLARSHIP BEING IN THE SUM OF $100 PER ANNUM, OR SUCH GREATER SUM AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
TAMESIDE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tameside MBC
Tameside One
PO BOX 317
MARKET PLACE
Ashton Under Lyne
OL6 6BH
- Phone:
- 01613422878
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window