NANTWICH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship and Christian service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 16 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Carol Alcock | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Coulter | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS APPLEBY | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robin Edward Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN THOMAS | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Norman George | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GRUNDY | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Crosbie Mrs | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE PLATT | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN MAIDMENT | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|||||
MARGARET KIRKMAN | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE ERIC KIRKMAN | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DENISE MARIA CHERYL LAWSON | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Maidment | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|||||
EILEEN SHEILA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Holland | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.73k | £52.18k | £47.87k | £75.69k | £75.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.25k | £59.91k | £64.52k | £56.38k | £64.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.94k | N/A | £3.25k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
HTTP://METHODIST.ORG.UK/MEDIA1841903/2483_CONF_2015_CPD_VOL_2.PDF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nantwich Methodist Church Centre
Hospital Street
NANTWICH
CW5 5RP
- Phone:
- 01270626340
- Email:
- NANTWICH.MC@BTCONNECT.COM
- Website:
-
nantwichmethodist.wix.com/nmcc
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window