THE MANSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable support to religious, educational and social well being organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 24 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN LAURENCE MANSON | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
LAUREN CHARLOTTE ORNSTEIN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL ABIGAIL MANSON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH RACHEL PETERS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD DAVID MANSON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.61k | £20.98k | £26.69k | £31.58k | £40.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.97k | £118.19k | £100.11k | £310.26k | £175.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 PARKLANDS
WHITEFIELD
MANCHESTER
M45 7WY
- Phone:
- 01612451201
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window