Financial history THE CASE FOUNDATION (CULTURE, ART, SPORTS, EDUCATION)

Charity number: 1167932
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £451.14k £2.05k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £358.52k £29.23k £50.28k £1.35k £15.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A