Financial history ASHFIELD EDUCATIONAL FUND (BUSHEY)

Charity Number: 1169602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.91k £4.33k £0 £3.30k £2.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A