Financial history GREAT OPEN DOOR

Charity number: 1169471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.06k £1.73k £8.39k £8.42k £6.22k
Total expenditure £1.59k £519 £6.89k £9.43k £9.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A