Trustees WYMONDHAM COMMUNITY RUGBY TRUST
Charity number: 1172480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Lydia Bosworth | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hood | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Saggers | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Sisson | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Anthony Scott | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Wootton | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Finbar Peter Conway | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Daniel Clover | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan John Anderson Brown | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.