Trustees SQUARE FOOD FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1173323

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dionne Emma Seagrove | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Howard Thomas | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Ladkin | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Michael Charles Mudie | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Elizabeth Miller | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Cole | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Pamela Flynn | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Farmer | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.