NEW MILTON EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Church are the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith, primarily but not exclusively within New Milton and the surrounding neighbourhood and such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the members of the Church in general meeting, put into practice the teaching of the Lord Jesus Christ in accordance with the Basis of Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMEON WOODCRAFT | Chair | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Douglas Harvey | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John White | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Fidler | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.56k | £136.61k | £123.41k | £101.49k | £162.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.10k | £84.34k | £263.77k | £116.67k | £124.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Jul 2016 as amended on 03 Feb 2023 as amended on 03 Feb 2023 as amended on 03 Feb 2023 as amended on 03 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN NEW MILTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE TEACHING OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evangelical Church
26 Whitefield Road
New Milton
BH25 6DF
- Phone:
- 01425622450
- Email:
- pastor_sim@btintenet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window