THE VOICES OF LONDON FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voices of London Festival celebrates the extraordinary range of vocal diversity on offer in the capital and beyond, the Festival showcases ensembles of all shapes and sizes, from community choruses and youth groups to professional chamber choirs and operatic ensembles. At the heart of our festival lies collaborative music making in a wide range of guises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 08 July 2016: CIO registration
- VOICES OF LONDON FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Nicholas Hillson | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HESS | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BARLOW | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84k | £648 | £0 | £1 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 November 2024 | 467 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 November 2024 | 467 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 November 2024 | 832 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 November 2024 | 832 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 August 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 August 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Croham Road
SOUTH CROYDON
Surrey
CR2 7HD
- Phone:
- 07708061488
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window