46TH COVENTRY (ALLESLEY PARK ) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 508265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,556
Total expenditure: £12,142

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 46TH COVENTRY (ALLESLEY) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Tiplady-Startin Chair 25 September 2024
None on record
Catherine Lee Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
James Morshead Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Louise Hicks Trustee 25 September 2024
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time
Louise Nurse Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Naomi Ots Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
James Andrew Ots Trustee 01 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ALLESLEY
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
REBECCA ELEMENT-FELLOWS Trustee 12 May 2022
ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION NO 8 AREA
Received: On time
Katy Coupe Trustee 14 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.40k £1.32k £12.27k £15.92k £13.56k
Total expenditure £5.86k £3.51k £3.65k £13.16k £12.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Rothesay Avenue
COVENTRY
CV4 9FJ
Phone:
07794265177