FND ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise awareness of functional neurological Disorder through the provision of current information to the general public, health sector, caregivers & those suffering from these symptoms. Promote awareness through online/offline resources, leaflets, social media, meetings, charitable events & other educational media. Develop our website to provide information, support, resources, signposting & more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Plender | Chair | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danyal Mackenzie | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenay Brehm | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Dickinson | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richmond Stace | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Richard Joseph Nicholson | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Shipley | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Rosser | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.99k | £18.25k | £23.55k | £30.65k | £28.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £3.40k | £23.38k | £23.31k | £39.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING WITH FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL DISORDER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RAISING AWARENESS OF FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL SYMPTOMS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CURRENT INFORMATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, HEALTH SECTOR, CAREGIVERS, AND THOSE SUFFERING FROM THESE SYMPTOMS. (2) PROMOTING AWARENESS OF FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL SYMPTOMS THROUGH CHARITABLE EVENTS, MEETINGS, SOCIAL MEDIA, ONLINE AND OFFLINE RESOURCES, INFORMATION PACKS, LEAFLETS, AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AS REQUIRED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (3) PROMOTING ONGOING RESEARCH FOR FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL SYMPTOMS BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION THROUGH OUR WEBSITE AND SOCIAL MEDIA, AND PUBLISHING RESULTS.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
5A NEW ROAD AVENUE
CHATHAM
KENT
ME4 6BB
- Phone:
- 07594651566
- Email:
- contact@fndaction.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window