KENT KINDNESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of children and young people who are unaccompanied asylum seekers and refugees, in particular by the provision of basic support education including classes in English and life skills and the provision of recreation and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 29 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Anne Taylor | Chair | 18 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Karen Norfolk | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Viji Kumar | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Griffen | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Khurshid McPhee | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Greer Doreen Mary Harris | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES BRAGGINS | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Curran | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HENRIETTA CATHERINE KING | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN ALEXANDER STEWART | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FELICITY ROEDER | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.79k | £13.31k | £18.27k | £13.81k | £21.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.19k | £7.78k | £11.99k | £18.14k | £15.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 08 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE UNACCOMPANIED ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF BASIC SUPPORT EDUCATION INCLUDING CLASSES IN ENGLISH AND LIFE SKILLS WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND (B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING: 1. EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS; 2. SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Cottage
Frittenden
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN17 2EJ
- Phone:
- 07773 196697
- Email:
- contact@kentkindness.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window