Financial history LUTON UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1167750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.62k £22.37k £16.98k £21.38k £30.83k
Total expenditure £10.88k £8.02k £10.66k £18.66k £23.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A