THE POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN READING

Charity number: 1170127
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of The Polish Saturday School in Reading is to advance education of young people between the ages of 4 and 20 in Reading and in surrounding areas, in Polish language, literature, history, geography, culture, tradition and Christian values.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £60,630
Total expenditure: £45,363

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading
  • West Berkshire
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • POLSKA SZKOłA SOBOTNIA W READING (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLIWIA MILEK-RICHARDS Chair 11 November 2016
None on record
MALGORZATA NIEDBALO Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record
Rev RAFAL JAROSLAWSKI Trustee 11 November 2016
THE POLISH CATHOLIC MISSION
Received: On time
POLISH RESISTANCE (AK) FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
JOANNA DADEJ Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £54.25k £42.25k £50.64k £49.80k £60.63k
Total expenditure £48.16k £43.34k £45.01k £43.88k £45.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 July 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 July 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
81 LONDON ROAD
READING
RG1 5BY
Phone:
07367337285
Website:

No information available