LIVING UNDER ONE SUN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Living Under One Sun is based in the heart of Tottenham. We actively create welcoming places to share stories, ideas and skills for people to become "can do" communities, embracing and leading positive change to include and benefit all cultures, backgrounds, abilities, ages and Nature - in neighbourhoods and globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £95,700 from 6 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
117 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 24 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERRY CLARK | Chair | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Benn | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Azadeh Fatehrad | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annabella Ritzau | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Stanger | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cherie Nelson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Warwick | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
LIVINGSTON GILCHRIST | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.52k | £263.10k | £348.43k | £245.95k | £340.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.60k | £188.48k | £265.86k | £268.30k | £333.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.91k | £74.27k | £15.44k | £95.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.75k | £9.59k | £10.00k | £25.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 MAR 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY, SKILLS AND LEADERSHIP ABILITIES OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TOTTENHAM AND OTHER SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED AREAS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES WHICH THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACCESS, IN ORDER TO WORK TOGETHER, LEARN BY EXPERIENCE AND RECOGNISE THEIR EXISTING SKILLS AS ASSETS, TO GAIN CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITIES AND, AS A RESULT, HELP IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 2. THE PROMOTION OF URBAN REGENERATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, LOCAL ECONOMICALLY OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED RESIDENTS, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: I) THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC HEALTH THROUGH HEALTHY LIVING ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING ORGANIC HORTICULTURE, FOOD GROWING, HERBAL MEDICINE, BEEKEEPING, HEALTHY COOKING AND EATING, SEWING, CYCLING AND WALKING; II) THE PROMOTION OF COMMON INTERESTS, EQUALITY, HARMONY AND SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE REDUCTION AND PREVENTION OF SOCIAL ISOLATION AND THE CELEBRATION OF DIFFERENCE AND DIVERSITY. III) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT THROUGH A RANGE OF INTERVENTIONS AND PATHWAYS, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND TRAINING AND ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT WHETHER AS AN EMPLOYEE OR ON A SELF-EMPLOYED BASIS, IV) THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; V) THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT. 3. TO FURTHER BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 4. TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neighbourhood Resource Centre
177 PARK LANE
London
N17 0HJ
- Phone:
- 02088016868
- Email:
- info@livingunderonesun.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window