Financial history DOMINICAN MISSIONARY SISTERS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS CIO

Charity Number: 1168379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £188.00k £279.51k £300.37k £121.16k £324.11k
Total expenditure £240.93k £297.08k £267.69k £242.17k £256.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A