DOMINICAN MISSIONARY SISTERS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Overseas Missionary work, supporting the international operations of the congregation, outreach and Interfaith work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- West Sussex
- Colombia
- Germany
- Kenya
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 July 2016: CIO registration
- 19 January 2018: Funds received from 1114375 DOMINICAN MISSIONARY SISTERS OF THE SACRED HEART O...
- DOMINICAN MISSIONARY SISTERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margret Musawa Musonda | Chair | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lucia Muchelenje | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chama Mwila | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Svorai Andria Mazhunga | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Lombe | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
SISTER FILOMINA MUPFIGO | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.00k | £279.51k | £300.37k | £121.16k | £324.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.93k | £297.08k | £267.69k | £242.17k | £256.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PRIORESS GENERAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) THE EDUCATION OF YOUTH AND THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THE CARRYING OUT OF SUCH WORK AMONGST THE POPULATION OF AFRICA; AND (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND HEALTH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (2) NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 GOSSOPS GREEN LANE
CRAWLEY
WEST SUSSEX
RH11 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01293524067
- Email:
- dom.sisters@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window