SPARKLES - SUPPORTING CHILDREN WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sparkles supports children with Down's syndrome in Buckinghamshire by the provision of speech and language therapies, funding of physiotherapy and occupational therapy sessions and organising appropriate leisure and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 July 2016: CIO registration
- 17 February 2025: Funds received from 1198075 BUCKS BAME NETWORK
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty MacCuish | Chair | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise Broadway | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bushra Maqsood | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eszter Hegedus-Bite | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAHAM SMITH | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.68k | £25.77k | £17.23k | £36.47k | £27.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.99k | £21.78k | £41.37k | £42.21k | £84.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME LIVING IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPIES, FUNDING PHYSIOTHERAPY AND OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY SESSIONS AND ORGANISING APPROPRIATE LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR SUCH CHILDREN
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Scholars Walk
Langley
SLOUGH
SL3 8LY
- Phone:
- 07825779460
- Email:
- hello@sparkles.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window