ST.PETERS PENGUINS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Early Years Child care in the context of a weekday pre-school setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 June 2016: CIO registration
- 08 August 2017: Funds received from 1121079 KIRKLEY PRE-SCHOOL
- KIRKLEY PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristen Lee | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
carla lee | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
jenna irving | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
jennifer bailey | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian Stephen Pryke | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.23k | £61.83k | £83.17k | £88.26k | £147.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.47k | £48.20k | £82.27k | £94.07k | £120.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £74.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.57k | £61.10k | N/A | £73.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 30 JUN 2016 AMENDED ON 28 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY THE OPERATION OF A PRE-SCHOOL PROVIDING CHILDCARE AND EARLY YEARS LEARNING SETTING IN A DISADVANTAGED AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Phoenix St. Peter Academy
Enstone Road
LOWESTOFT
Suffolk
NR33 0NE
- Phone:
- 07765198523
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window