COQUETDALE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since the temporary closure of the Rothbury Community Ward the Coquetdale League of Friends continues to support the local health services and their patients in the community with equipment and services to enhance the provision and access to health care in this very rural area. We look forward to the re opening of the ward planned for 2022.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Northumberland
Governance
- 31 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monica Ronaldson | Chair | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rutherford | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jacob | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bell | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Heywood | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/08/2019 | 18/08/2020 | 18/08/2021 | 18/08/2022 | 18/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250 | £250 | £212 | £3.40k | £1.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £3.55k | £7.86k | £280 | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE COQUETDALE COTTAGE HOSPITAL, AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
COQUETDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croft House
Hillside East
Rothbury
MORPETH
NE65 7YF
- Phone:
- 01669 620109
- Email:
- cathyjacob@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window