THE EAST COAST CHURCHES AND COMMUNITY MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community based organisation working with community and church organisations, schools, local authority music services, private music teachers, singing and choral societies to provide opportunities for public performances and to enhance life-style opportunities for all ages through the Arts and especially music making. Our activities are centred on Bridlington and the surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Leeds City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 January 2017: Standard registration
- EAST COAST CHURCHES AND COMMUNITY MUSIC FESTIVALS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL LOWE | Chair | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Hanley | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gradwell | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gee | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Simpson Watts | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Bowtell | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elizabeth Daniel | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £165 | £860 | £3.41k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £361 | £1.14k | £2.42k | £1.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC PERFORMANCE AND THE ARTS. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DIOCESE OF YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Church
70 Cardigan Road
BRIDLINGTON
East Riding of Yorkshire
YO15 3JT
- Phone:
- 07967648566
- Email:
- paulandjunelowe@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window