THE WINDSOR BENEFIT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the arts and music in and around Windsor, the preservation, restoration and maintenance of items of architectural/historical significance in and around Windsor and other charitable purposes in and around Windsor including making grants to The Outdoor Trust to maintain/operate its walkways in Windsor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDITE ALEXANDRA IZABELLA LIGERE | Chair | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Simon John Newton Treadgold | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Hugo Vickers DL | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER GRANT AITKEN | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.87k | £10.00k | £335.04k | £243.03k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.04k | £1.46k | £233.25k | £302.33k | £64.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CLASSICAL MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ARRANGING CLASSICAL MUSIC CONCERTS AND THEATRICAL AND LITERARY EVENTS IN AND AROUND WINDSOR. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, REFURBISHMENT, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF ITEMS OF ARCHITECTURAL OR HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE IN OR IN RELATION TO ST. GEORGE'S CHAPEL, WINDSOR. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AND AROUND WINDSOR BY MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO THE OUTDOOR TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1148702) TO MAINTAIN AND OPERATE ITS WINDSOR WALK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 5A
Maple House
149 Tottenham Court Road
LONDON
W1T 7NF
- Phone:
- 02073833200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window