SOUTH EAST 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity Number: 1168367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Southeast 4x4 Response is a volunteer group of ordinary people who are willing to use their own four wheel drive vehicles to assist the wider community in times of need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £38,345
Total expenditure: £23,286

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent
  • Medway
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 July 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sue Butterfill Trustee 19 June 2024
WAR MEMORIAL HALL AT PLATT
Received: On time
Graham Eastgate Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Maxim David George Webb Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Dean Smith Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
David Mills Trustee 05 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.18k £11.92k £17.58k £16.60k £38.35k
Total expenditure £7.24k £8.58k £13.30k £14.61k £23.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
South East 4x4 Response
c/o Kent Police Tactical Operations
Coldharbour
London Road
Aylesford
Kent
Phone:
07525863029