UK INDIA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds in the UK to support poor individuals and projects primarily in INDIA. To provide grants and support to alleviate hunger, poverty, hardship and preventive blindness. To raise awareness of the plight of the poor and homeless in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Thailand
Governance
- 29 November 2016: CIO registration
- UKIF (Working name)
- UK INDIA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHESH KUMAR SINGADIA Chairman | Chair | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ARTHUR ALLEN | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMARJIT SINGH SAHIB | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAHESH KUMAR SINGADIA | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £12.50k | £12.50k | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £740 | £1.81k | £620 | £1.62k | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CHARITABLE SUPPORT ACROSS UK AND INDIA (AREA OF BENEFIT) THROUGH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS, PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OF ANY DESCRIPTION, (E.G.) DEPRESSION, BLINDNESS), OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS,GOODS OR SERVICES (E.G. HOUSING PROVISION, FOOD PARCELS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marlin House
459 London Road
Camberley
Surrey
GU13 3JA
- Phone:
- 07770815070
- Email:
- mahesh@dialstart.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window