Financial history OWEN MCVEIGH FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1167794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £200.00k £137.23k £304.55k £360.47k £257.29k
Total expenditure £121.29k £112.23k £162.12k £224.94k £244.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A