Financial history PALMERS OF SHREWSBURY

Charity number: 1169054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £145.31k £84.21k £166.48k £177.25k £198.56k
Total expenditure £145.31k £89.36k £152.85k £184.04k £203.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.18k £8.22k £167 N/A