GRAFTON CENTRE DEVELOPMENT TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1169169
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We operate from our building, The Grafton Centre, Grafton Street, Hyde. SK162AX. Open Monday to Friday 09:00 to 16:00.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £87,007
Total expenditure: £103,875

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP FITZPATRICK Chair 14 September 2016
None on record
Andrea Colbourne Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Clair Owen Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Denise Ward Trustee 02 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £109.56k £74.91k £111.35k £102.45k £87.01k
Total expenditure £108.15k £78.36k £76.01k £106.05k £103.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £28.17k £14.88k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 May 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 May 2024 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Grafton Centre
Grafton Street
HYDE
SK14 2AX
Phone:
01613684110