ASCOT ROAD PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Done since September 2016: cake sale, sponsored swimmathon, Disco, Christmas Fair. Future events 2017: Jumble sale, Adult Quiz Night, Kids Army Boot camp, film nights
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 June 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 June 2016: Standard registration
- 09 December 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2018: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF ASCOT ROAD COMMUNITY FREE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alina Marcuta | Chair | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/06/2019 | 23/06/2020 | 23/06/2021 | 23/06/2022 | 23/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £4.64k | £0 | £410 | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £8.25k | £5 | £229 | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 23 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2022 | 16 July 2024 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2021 | 23 May 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2020 | 23 May 2022 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2016 as amended on 05 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASCOT ROAD
WATFORD
HERTFORDSHIRE
WD18 8AD
- Phone:
- 07917541156
- Email:
- contact.Ascotpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window