Accounts and annual returns R U SAYCE BEQUEST

Charity number: 508306
Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2025 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2025 1095 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days