THOMAS WHITE COTTAGE HOMES (2016) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of almshouse accommodation for ladies in need of not less than 60 years of age, preferring such ladies who are resident in the area of the Ancient Parish of Bromsgrove
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 August 2016: CIO registration
- 07 October 2017: Funds received from 238741 WHITE'S COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
- TOMMY WHITES (Working name)
- WHITES COTTAGE HOMES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Julie Hirst | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|||||
David John Foster | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Patricia Reading | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Prudence Maund | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Winnett Stafford | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Schirrmacher | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rayman Anthony Khan | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MATTHEW HORTON | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.33k | £63.44k | £76.33k | £131.59k | £102.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.25k | £41.57k | £72.32k | £81.29k | £169.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Aug 2016 as amended on 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN IN NEED OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH WOMEN WHO ARE RESIDENT AT THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BROMSGROVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Maxtock Avenue
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 6PE
- Phone:
- 07799412274
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window