WE ARE ONE (OUTREACH NORTH EAST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hot food provision on a Saturday night, food box provisiond during the week
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 June 2016: CIO registration
- 11 June 2019: Funds received from 1027368 GRIMSBY CLEETHORPES DISTRICT PATHFINDER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WELLS | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Lowry | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ernest Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kay Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Willerton | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Wells | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.53k | £50.89k | £68.16k | £51.32k | £81.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £54.61k | £58.64k | £43.57k | £61.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 JUN 2016 AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2023 as amended on 31 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN GRIMSBY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
334 Grimsby Road
Humberston
GRIMSBY
DN36 4AA
- Phone:
- 01472460246
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window