NEW BRIGHTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of New Brighton without distinction of sex of political, religious or other opinions by associating the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £33,931 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wirral
Governance
- 27 December 1978: Standard registration
- 30 March 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1146024 CHARLOTTE'S BRIGHTSIDE C.L.C
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.83k | £39.40k | £31.54k | £61.00k | £41.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.17k | £37.95k | £31.52k | £36.00k | £44.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £19.00k | £33.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEW BRIGHTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, ETHNIC OR SOCIAL ORIGIN OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NEW BRIGHTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window