NAVEUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NavEurope aims to support local Navigator initiatives across Europe, to develop current and emerging Navigator leaders in Europe, and to provide Navigator European student training programmes. It does this in the context of advancing the Christian religion in Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Austria
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Italy
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
Governance
- 31 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS APPLETON | Chair | 31 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Hannah Rachel Jaeschke | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elise Sandblost Angen | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON NEVILLE WROE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicolas Guerineau | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Malmstrom Iversen | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Yearsley | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Magnus Axel Halling | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sijtze Brandsma | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL LACO | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ING CEES HORDIJK | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor FRANK CLEMENS SCHLICHTENBREDE | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.38k | £111.29k | £105.77k | £168.16k | £166.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.86k | £96.74k | £54.68k | £200.85k | £178.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN EUROPE AND SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH EVANGELISM, TEACHING, MENTORING, TRAINING, INDIVIDUAL PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF RELATED MATERIAL AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 THE AVENUE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 1XQ
- Phone:
- 02380558800
- Email:
- info@navigators.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window