PEGASUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the Trustees see fit from time to time. The charity will operate as a grant making charity, supporting charitable projects, organisations and individuals with grants of varying sizes and durations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA JANE ENGBARTH | Chair | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA ABIGAIL JEFFREY | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE KENYON | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Emily Kenyon | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £5.00m | £120.58k | £1.17m | £171.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.01k | £65.77k | £184.88k | £229.37k | £25.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £5.00m | N/A | £1.09m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £595 | N/A | £87.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £5.00m | N/A | £1.09m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £65.77k | N/A | £225.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £3.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | £10.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £59.77k | N/A | £215.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £3.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAWLINSON & HUNTER
6 NEW STREET SQUARE
LONDON
EC4A 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02033931044
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window