LINE OF DUTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity identifies suitably qualified and experienced providers of a range of health care services and therapy and arranges for treatment of the intended beneficiaries, upon checking eligibility, and payment of that treatment via donations from the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW JAMES COLLEY | Chair | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH EDWIN BRIAN STEPHENSON | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.05k | £65.65k | £96.70k | £98.28k | £19.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.50k | £65.34k | £70.41k | £137.53k | £16.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH; AND (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND NEED, BY (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT TO: (A) CURRENT AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH ARMED FORCES AND THEIR VOLUNTEER RESERVES AND OF THE EMERGENCY AND RESCUE SERVICES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN INJURED DURING SUCH SERVICE, IN ORDER TO FURTHER THEIR TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, RESETTLEMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT; AND (B) THE DEPENDANTS AND FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, ÔINJUREDÖ MEANS SUSTAINING INJURY OR IMPAIRMENT TO PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Poplicans Road
Cuxton
ROCHESTER
ME2 1EJ
- Phone:
- 07903041023
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window