Trustees THE WEST YORKSHIRE ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 508313

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Haytack | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Christopher Evans | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Edward Barry Owen | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Goodway | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Redburn | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Goodway | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Wright | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wright | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terry Dobson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Clark | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.