THE OLD APOSTOLIC CHURCH (ENGLAND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the gospel of Jesus Christ in the doctrine of the Church for the benefit of the public.Establishing and maintaining faith in Jesus Christ,makes people new creatures and instils a personal and living confidence,uplifting them from the cares of the world to express themselves with joy and glory- receiving the end of their faith,namely the salvation of their souls,which is in Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Courtney Smit | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Maritz | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andre Herbst | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MANDY FOURIE | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
UWE JACOB | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHELDON KELLY PAYNE | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GORDON MILES REINEKE | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERND HANS-GEORG RICHTER | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES LOUIS LOYALTY ROBUS | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.40k | £162.45k | £176.33k | £156.93k | £213.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.07k | £15.28k | £12.92k | £46.53k | £106.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST IN THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; TO ESTABLISH CONGREGATIONS FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE SAID DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND TO ESTABLISH SUNDAY SCHOOLS CHOIRS AND OTHER FUNCTIONS HAVING FOR THEIR OBJECTS THE INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING OF THE ADHERENTS IN THE SAID DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Station Road
Kings Langley
WD4 8LB
- Phone:
- 07739459627
- Email:
- SHELDONPAYNE@GOOGLEMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window