4X4 RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect human life and property, in particular but not exclusively, by providing equipment, vehicles and other resources to offer support in adverse conditions. To promote and represent the 4x4 Response movement at National and Regional level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 July 2016: CIO registration
- 01 April 2022: Funds received from 1126138 4X4 RESPONSE
- 4X4 RESPONSE UK (Working name)
- 4X4RUK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Anthony Halsey | Chair | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Browne | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Leigh Ryder | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Robin Tunstall | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kalvin Richard McLeod | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £4.19k | £75 | £939 | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330 | £91 | £1.04k | £1.34k | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, VEHICLES AND OTHER RESOURCES TO OFFER SUPPORT IN ADVERSE CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 RECTORY DRIVE
YATTON
BRISTOL
BS49 4HF
- Phone:
- 03000750140
- Email:
- info@4x4response.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window