WINDERMERE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of assets and distribution of income, for the benefit of schools and pupils in the ancient parish of Windermere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 June 1979: Standard registration
- 15 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES JOHNSTON RICHARDS | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Caroline Kearney | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Andrew Guy Jarvis | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen James Bavin | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Christine Hallatsch | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Mr Will Clark | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
LISA GREASLEY | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MR NC MARTIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.09k | £8.32k | £12.47k | £10.85k | £11.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.47k | £7.32k | £12.72k | £20.12k | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 25TH OCTOBER 1966
Charitable objects
1. TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO THE MANAGERS OF WINDERMERE ENDOWED &RIMARY SCHOOL FOR ITS MAINTENANCE AND PROVISION. 2. TO APPLY SUCH FURTHER SUMS IN MAKING PAYMENT TO THE MANAGERS AND GOVERNORS OF ANY VOLUNTARY SCHOOL IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WINDERMERE. 3. TO ASSIST THE PROMOTERS OF ANY SCHOOL TO BE ESTABLISHED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WINDERMERE IN WHICH RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IS TO BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND WHICH IS TO BE CONDUCTED AS A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1965
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WINDERMERE
Linked charities
- 29 June 1979 : Standard registration
- 15 October 2009 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BROW CRESCENT
WINDERMERE
LA23 2EY
- Phone:
- 01539443183
- Email:
- jigbusteruk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window