LANCASHIRE HINDU ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Lancashire whether members of the association or otherwise and in particular those of Hindu origin regardless of sex, political, religious or other opinions by Advancing education which promotes good citizenship and good relations between people within a multi-racial, multi-cultural and multi-faith society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUBRAMANIAM SIVASHANKAR | Chair | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELAMANA NANDAKUMAR | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIVA MAIKANDANATHAN | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SURESH KUMAR PULIMCHUVATTIL KUTTAN | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KRISHNAKUMARI SRINIVASAN | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £1.40k | £2.07k | £4.33k | £6.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £342 | £1.04k | £1.10k | £4.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANCASHIRE WHETHER MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OR OTHERWISE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF HINDU ORIGIN REGARDLESS OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: 1. ADVANCING EDUCATION WHICH PROMOTES GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE WITHIN A MULTI-RACIAL, MULTI-CULTURAL AND MULTI-FAITH SOCIETY. 2. ASSOCIATING AND CO-OPERATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS OR INDIVIDUALS WITH THE COMMON AIM OF ADVANCING SUCH EDUCATION AND IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES CONCERNING SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE INDIVIDUALS DESCRIBED IN THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION, AND 3. ESTABLISHING OR SECURING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MANAGING OR CO-OPERATING WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 01254825938
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window