THE MIDLANDS AIR MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 508326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the education of the public in the preservation of aircraft and aeronautical equipment of historical, technical or other public interest relating to Coventry in particular and to the Midlands and aviation generally. The Museum's mission is to be recognised as one of the leading independent collections, renowned for its friendly atmosphere and exceptional standards of customer service.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £226,284
Total expenditure: £224,607

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY JAMES Chair
None on record
David Carter Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
IVOR WELFORD Trustee
None on record
GORDON TALBOT Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY EVANS Trustee
None on record
MARK PAINTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £186.45k £94.43k £181.76k £220.63k £226.28k
Total expenditure £166.20k £141.45k £147.42k £193.26k £224.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.98k £51.97k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MIDLAND AIR MUSEUM
COVENTRY ROAD
BAGINTON
COVENTRY
CV8 3AZ
Phone:
02476301033