SRI GURU TEG BAHADAR GURDWARA NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
community centre, language classes, cooking classes, sewing classes, music classes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 08 January 1979: Standard registration
- SRI GURU TEG BAHADUR GURDWARA (Working name)
- GURDWARA SIKH TEMPLE SINGH SABHA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SINDER SINGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NIRMAL SINGH | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHAMAK SINGH POTIWAL | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
GURMEET SINGH TAAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GURCHARN SINGH BHAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.22k | £40.82k | £40.82k | £88.48k | £120.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.40k | £20.62k | £20.62k | £63.07k | £88.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 DECEMBER 1978 AND 05 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SHRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO ACQUIRE AND HOLD PROPERTY FOR USE AS A SIKH TEMPLE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME AND TO HOLD RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND OTHER FUNCTIONS OF A RELIGIOUS NATURE IN CONNECTION WITH BIRTHS, MARRIAGES, DEATHS AND SIKH RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND UPON SUCH OTHER OCCASIONS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE. (2) TO RELIEVE CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG MEMBERS OF THE GURUDWARA BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE IN CONNECTION WITH THE SOLUTION OF PROBLEMS ENCOUNTERED AS A RESULT OF AN INADEQUATE COMMAND OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SRI GURU TEG BAHADUR
36 CHURCH STREET
LENTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2FF
- Phone:
- 07876704699
- Email:
- gsbhaker@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window