DARTINGTON RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide or assist in the provision of land and play facilities for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Dartington and the surrounding area, for recreation, sport, swimming, education or other leisure time occupation of groups and individuals who have need of such facilities. Provision of football field, pool and playground for young children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,487 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 17 August 2016: CIO registration
- 18 April 2017: Funds received from 300810 DARTINGTON RECREATION ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mark Burton | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Doherty | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard John Brittain | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Peter Riley | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Huish | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Tune | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Maddick | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Marion Cushen | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Louise Morpeth | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.81k | £117.80k | £93.63k | £105.58k | £110.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.81k | £100.74k | £92.20k | £83.94k | £99.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.45k | £67.34k | £35.27k | N/A | £10.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Aug 2016 as amended on 11 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF LAND AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DARTINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND OF SUCH OTHER AREA OR AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME RESOLVE TO INVITE, FOR RECREATION, SPORT, EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meadow Brook Community Centre
Shinners Bridge
Dartington
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 6JD
- Phone:
- 07856686821
- Email:
- dartingtonra@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window