Financial history TWOCAN INCLUSIVE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1171196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.81k £18.94k £25.45k £36.34k £115.38k
Total expenditure £12.30k £13.36k £20.45k £33.39k £92.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.50k £3.00k £13.00k £51.36k