Trustees TWOCAN INCLUSIVE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1171196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REBECCA LOUISE ANDREWS Chair 21 March 2014
None on record
Molly Martin Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
GARRY WILDIN Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
NOOR AL-KOKY Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
ROBERT LESLIE SURREY Trustee 23 April 2014
None on record