REDBOURN CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity looks to support the community in the Parish of Redbourn by making grants to individuals, organisations, and community projects to enhance the general welfare of the residents. We support families with special needs and provide grants for educational purposes, for activities for the lonely and elderly, for youth groups, and for developing facilities in the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY JOHN WELCH | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sydney Dennis Poole | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £44.58k | £307 | £6 | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.23k | £60.12k | £104.85k | £3.13k | £3.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY NAMELY TO ASSIST, MANAGE AND SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORKS AND PURPOSES OF THE REDBOURN CARE GROUP REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 297955, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE PARISH OF REDBOURN HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS, SICKNESS AND LONELINESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redbourn Village Hall
63 High Street
Redbourn
ST. ALBANS
AL3 7LW
- Phone:
- 01582794550
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window