Trustees URSULINE SISTERS BRENTWOOD CIO

Charity number: 1168579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael L'Estrange Chair 15 June 2015
FRIENDS OF THE VENERABILE
Received: On time
Susan Diane Cooper Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
SISTER CLARE KANE Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record
NICOLINA LYON Trustee 14 January 2014
None on record
SISTER MARGARET SOPER Trustee 16 April 2013
None on record
SISTER ANNE SPILBERG OSU Trustee
None on record